+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (52)
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act 014, 08/27/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
On August 28, 2020 in the House:
- Act 014, on 08/27/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
On July 10, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 424).
On July 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ohno excused (2).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
- Reconsideration of action taken on 07-08-20.
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 418).
On July 8, 2020 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 615) in amended form (SD 3).
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
- Floor Amendment No. 12 offered.
- Report filed.
- Separated Committee Report.
- One Day Notice 07-08-20.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3776) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 07-02-20 10:00AM in conference room Auditorium.
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3678) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
- The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 06-24-20 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:20PM in conference room 224.
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/HRE, JDC/WAM.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 27).
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nakamura, Nishimoto.
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 622-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-12-20 at 2:15 PM.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Onishi voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 8:30AM in conference room 312.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20 at 8:30 AM.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.