+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 148).
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt, Tupola.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-08-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 12
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor