+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:05PM in House conference room 329.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor