+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 2:00PM in conference room 229.
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Riviere.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 486) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3368) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2918) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Slom.
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 78).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 739-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, San Buenaventura, Say excused (3).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 56-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor