+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 143, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Act 143, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 77-14).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 77-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Belatti, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 1:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-22-14 10:10AM in conference room 423.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Green, Ige Co-Chairs; Kouchi, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takai, Belatti, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ward Member.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3366) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:05AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3026) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 251).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
- Reported from VMI/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Oshiro.
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott, Wooley.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by VMI/HLT on Wednesday, 02-12-14 9:25AM in conference room 329.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI/HLT on Wednesday, 02-12-14 9:25AM in House conference room 312.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to VMI/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor