+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 82-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 2
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor