+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-30-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor