+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-03-14 9:40AM in House conference room Auditorium.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, referral sheet 3
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.