+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-05-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor