+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor