+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDC.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-16-17 11:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WAL, JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor