+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-11-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.