+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 102, 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Act 102, on 6/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1203).
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 721).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-29-14.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-21-14.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-10-14.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3393) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:05AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3033) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi, Slom.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/WTL, WAM.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 53).
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 570-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 142-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 01-30-14 9:20AM in House conference room 312.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor