+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 01-29-14 8:45AM in House conference room 325.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 3
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor