+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 120, 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Act 120, on 6/20/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 27-14).
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 27-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Rhoads, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673).
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads, Takayama Co-Chairs; McDermott Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: English Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Slom Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 55
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3354) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2962) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 1:16PM in conference room 224.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TIA, WAM.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 42).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to TIA, JDL.
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Kawakami.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-07-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.