+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 464) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamashita.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.