+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-25-19 10:35AM in House conference room 423.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor