+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3066) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-20-14 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 131).
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 130-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Woodson.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-30-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor