+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Onishi, Tsuji, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott, Souki excused (2).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 102-16).
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 102-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday, 04-27-16 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 225.
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Cullen, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 9:05AM in conference room 225.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 225.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652).
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Pouha.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Slom.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 524) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3544) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, Slom.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3067) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kidani, Slom.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 958-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 517-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor