+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Jordan voting no (1) and none excused (0).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33-16).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Lowen, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 2:15PM in conference room 423.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 2:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kim, Inouye Co-Chairs.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Lowen Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Pouha.
- Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 51
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 467) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-07-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3351) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-16 9:30AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-22-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Ruderman, L. Thielen.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/GVO, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 205).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3).
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 16
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- HD 1 adopted and recommitted to EEP for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Tokioka excused.
- Recommends recommittal to EEP.
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279-16) as amended in HD 1.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-09-16 11:35AM in conference room 325.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, referral sheet 1
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor