+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 1:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 2:10PM in conference room 312.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 312.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Wakai.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Kong, McDermott.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 486) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1331) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Taniguchi.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 228).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1005) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor