+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass Final Reading. Ayes, 7. Aye(s) with reservations, 1 (Senator(s) Espero); Noes, 17 (Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, English, Gabbard, Green, Hee, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Solomon, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen).
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 05-01-14.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Luke, Cullen, Ichiyama, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tsuji.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 329.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 5:00pm in conference room 329.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 1:00PM in Conference Room 329.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ige, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kidani.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143-14) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143-14).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-23-14 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 692).
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Added: Representative Tsuji added as member.
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Espero, Kahele, Kidani Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Choy, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Ichiyama, Matsumoto Members.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3361) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211.
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2868) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Tokuda.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 50).
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 580-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Mizuno, Oshiro excused (4).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 361-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 01-28-14 2:00PM in conference room 309.
- Meeting Scheduled on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:00PM in conference room 309 has been canceled.
On January 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 01-23-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor