+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ing, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Learmont, Quinlan.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-18 2:00PM.
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 01-30-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor