+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On July 11, 2018 in the House:
- Act 193, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 193, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 696).
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 683).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-18.
- The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Nishimoto, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 11:05AM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 2:15PM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:30PM in conference room 229.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Nishihara.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nishimoto, Cachola Co-Chairs; McDermott.
- Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 557) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-06-18.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3514) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3073) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 48).
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.