+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEA, WAM.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 70).
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Pouha, Thielen voting no (3) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 629-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Ohno, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Kong, Say, Tupola.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-16-16 2:02PM in House conference room 309. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor