+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 008, 05/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Act 008, on 05/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Choy excused (1).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 612).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 595) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-10-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3014) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 8).
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-16-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 69-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
- Introduced and Pass First Reading
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor