+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
- Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:15AM in House conference room 325.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor