+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-07-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor