+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 212), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 11
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.