+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 302), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.