+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on EET deferred the measure.
- The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO/EET, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Mizuno, Evans, Saiki, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-17-16 2:00PM in House conference room 423.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor