+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 225).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Oshiro, Wooley voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Ing, Jordan, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Choy, Hanohano, Oshiro voting no (3) and Awana, Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Awana, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 02-03-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor