+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 196).
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-16 2:00PM in room 325.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-28-16 2:01PM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor