+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Takayama; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor