+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-07-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Creagan, Ing, Johanson, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Oshiro, Rhoads, Ward, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 77-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor