+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Cullen, Lowen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 01-31-14 11:00AM in conference room 325.
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-31-14 at 11:00am.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 01-29-14 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 01-29-14.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 01-24-14 9:45AM in House conference room 325.
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 01-24-14 9:30AM in conference room 325.
- Re-referred to WAL/OMH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-24-14 9:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor