+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 019, 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Act 019, on 4/15/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 492).
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-04-14.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3261) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2853) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223).
- Referred to CPN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Wooley.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Say.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 02-03-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325.
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 2
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor