+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor