+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 43) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor