+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 880) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1935) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 327).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.