+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.