+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor