+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor