+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-17-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled.