+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 328-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ito, Kong, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-09-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 38-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har.
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor