+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Oshiro, McDermott.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor