+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1478) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 316).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor