+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 11, 2018 in the House:
- Act 192, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 192, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 70-18).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 70-18) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Ihara.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Kobayashi, Ward.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 397).
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 447) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3070) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-27-18.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-15-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 259).
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1028-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 26
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 18
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
- Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused.
- Recommends recommittal to CPC.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111-18) as amended in HD 1.
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno, Yamane, McDermott.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-02-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor