+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 667).
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831).
- House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Ruderman.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Ruderman.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cachola Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 666) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1544) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 016.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-17 2:50PM in conference room 224.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, JDL.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 19).
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 734), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor