+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor